Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 03/20/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 03/20/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 03/20/1989
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 03/20/1989
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/05/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 05/09/1989
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/09/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/10/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/17/1989
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/23/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/23/1989
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 06/06/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/06/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/06/1989
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 06/06/1989
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 06/22/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 06/22/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/29/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/29/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 07/18/1989
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 08/01/1989
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/27/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 01/30/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 01/30/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 01/30/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 01/30/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 01/30/1990