Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 03/23/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/23/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 03/23/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 03/23/1989
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2]* 03/23/1989
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 04/26/1989
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/26/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 04/26/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/26/1989
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/26/1989
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 04/26/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 04/26/1989
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 04/26/1989
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/26/1989
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/26/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 04/26/1989
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/17/1989
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/17/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/17/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/17/1989
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 05/17/1989
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 05/17/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/17/1989
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/17/1989
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 05/17/1989
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 05/17/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/17/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/17/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/17/1989
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/17/1989
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 05/17/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/17/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/17/1989
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/15/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 06/15/1989
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/15/1989
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 06/15/1989
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 06/15/1989
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 06/15/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/15/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 06/15/1989
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 06/15/1989
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 06/15/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 07/17/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 07/17/1989
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 07/17/1989
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 07/17/1989
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 07/17/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 07/17/1989
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 07/17/1989
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 07/17/1989
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 07/17/1989
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 07/17/1989
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 10/24/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 10/24/1989
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/24/1989
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 10/24/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/24/1989
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 10/24/1989
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 10/24/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 10/24/1989
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 10/24/1989
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/24/1989
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 10/24/1989
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/24/1989
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 10/24/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 11/20/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 01/23/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 02/07/1990
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 02/07/1990
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/07/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/07/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 02/07/1990
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 02/27/1990
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 02/27/1990
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 02/27/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 02/27/1990
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 02/27/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/02/1990
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 05/02/1990
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/02/1990
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/02/1990
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/21/1990
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 06/21/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/21/1990
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/21/1990
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/21/1990
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 06/21/1990
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 06/21/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/21/1990
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/21/1990
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 06/21/1990