Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1]* 04/13/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 04/13/1989
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 04/13/1989
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 04/13/1989
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 04/13/1989
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 04/13/1989
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 04/26/1989
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/26/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 04/26/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 04/26/1989
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/26/1989
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 04/26/1989
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 04/26/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/26/1989
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 04/26/1989
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/26/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/26/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/26/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 04/26/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/26/1989
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/26/1989
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 04/26/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/26/1989
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 04/26/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 04/26/1989
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 04/26/1989
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 04/26/1989
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 04/26/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 04/26/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 04/26/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/26/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/26/1989
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 04/26/1989
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 04/26/1989
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 04/26/1989
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 04/26/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/26/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 04/26/1989
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 04/26/1989
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 05/02/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 05/02/1989
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 05/02/1989
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 05/02/1989
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 05/02/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/02/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 05/02/1989
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 05/02/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 05/02/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/22/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 05/22/1989
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/22/1989
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 05/22/1989
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/22/1989
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 05/22/1989
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 05/22/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/22/1989
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 06/07/1989
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/07/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 09/07/1989
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 09/07/1989
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/07/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/21/1990
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 02/21/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 02/21/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 02/21/1990
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 02/21/1990
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 02/21/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/22/1990
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/22/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 02/22/1990
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 02/22/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/22/1990
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 02/27/1990
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/27/1990
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 02/27/1990
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 02/27/1990
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/27/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 02/27/1990
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 03/06/1990
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 03/06/1990
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 03/06/1990
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 03/06/1990
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 03/20/1990
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/20/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 03/20/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 07/16/1990
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 07/17/1990
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/17/1990