Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 06/29/1989
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 07/11/1989
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 07/11/1989
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 07/11/1989
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 07/11/1989
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 07/11/1989
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/11/1989
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 07/11/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 07/11/1989
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 07/11/1989
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 07/11/1989
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 07/11/1989
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/11/1989
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 07/11/1989
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 07/11/1989
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 07/11/1989
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/11/1989
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 07/11/1989
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 07/11/1989
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 07/11/1989
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 07/11/1989
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 07/11/1989
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 07/11/1989
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 07/11/1989
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 07/11/1989
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/11/1989
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 07/11/1989
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/11/1989
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/11/1989
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/11/1989
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/11/1989
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 07/11/1989
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 07/11/1989
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 07/11/1989
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 07/11/1989
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 07/11/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/11/1989
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 07/11/1989
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 07/11/1989
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 07/11/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 07/11/1989
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 07/11/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/11/1989
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/11/1989
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 07/11/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/11/1989
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 07/11/1989
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 07/11/1989
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 07/11/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/11/1989
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 07/11/1989
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/11/1989
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/11/1989
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 07/11/1989
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 07/11/1989
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/11/1989
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/11/1989
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 07/11/1989
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/11/1989
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/11/1989
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/11/1989
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/11/1989
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 07/11/1989
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 07/11/1989
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 07/11/1989
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 07/11/1989
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 07/11/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 07/11/1989
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 07/11/1989
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 07/11/1989
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 07/11/1989
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/11/1989
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 07/11/1989
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/11/1989
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 07/11/1989
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 07/11/1989
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/12/1989
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 07/12/1989
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 07/12/1989
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 07/12/1989
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/12/1989
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 07/12/1989
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/12/1989
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/12/1989
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 07/12/1989
Rep. Smith, Larkin [R-MS-5] 07/12/1989
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/12/1989
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 07/12/1989
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 07/12/1989
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 07/12/1989
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 07/12/1989
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 07/12/1989
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 07/12/1989
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 07/12/1989
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 07/12/1989
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 07/12/1989
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 07/12/1989
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 07/12/1989
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 07/12/1989
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 07/12/1989
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 07/12/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/12/1989
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 07/12/1989
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/13/1989
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 07/13/1989
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 07/13/1989
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 07/13/1989
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 07/13/1989
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 07/13/1989
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/13/1989
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 07/13/1989
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/13/1989
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/18/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 07/18/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 07/18/1989
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/18/1989
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 07/18/1989
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 07/18/1989
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 07/18/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 07/18/1989
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 07/18/1989
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/18/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 07/18/1989
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 07/18/1989
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/18/1989
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 07/19/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 07/19/1989
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/19/1989
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/19/1989
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/19/1989
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 07/19/1989
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 07/24/1989
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 07/24/1989
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 07/24/1989
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/24/1989
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 07/24/1989
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/24/1989
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/24/1989
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 07/24/1989
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 07/24/1989
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/24/1989
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 07/24/1989
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 07/24/1989
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 07/24/1989
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 07/24/1989
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 07/24/1989
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 07/24/1989
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 07/24/1989
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/24/1989
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/24/1989
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 07/24/1989
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 07/24/1989
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/24/1989
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 07/24/1989
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 07/24/1989
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 07/24/1989
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 07/24/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/26/1989
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 07/26/1989
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 07/26/1989
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14] 07/26/1989
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 08/03/1989
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 08/03/1989
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/12/1989
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 09/12/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 09/12/1989
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 10/23/1989
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/03/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/07/1990
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 06/12/1990
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/12/1990
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/13/1990
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 06/13/1990
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 06/13/1990
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/13/1990
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/13/1990
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 06/13/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/13/1990
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 06/13/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 06/13/1990
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 06/13/1990
Rep. Douglas, Chuck [R-NH-2] 06/14/1990
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/14/1990
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/20/1990
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 06/20/1990
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 06/20/1990

Show cosponsors who withdrew