Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 01/29/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 01/29/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 01/29/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 01/29/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 01/29/1990
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 01/29/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 01/29/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 01/29/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 01/29/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 01/29/1990
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 01/29/1990
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 01/29/1990
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 01/29/1990
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 01/29/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 01/29/1990
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 01/29/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 01/29/1990
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 01/29/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 01/29/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 01/29/1990
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 01/29/1990
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 01/29/1990
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 01/29/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 01/29/1990
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 01/29/1990
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 01/29/1990
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 01/29/1990
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 02/20/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/20/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/20/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/20/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/20/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 02/20/1990
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/20/1990
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 02/20/1990
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 02/20/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 02/20/1990
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 02/20/1990
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 02/20/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 02/20/1990
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 02/20/1990
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 02/20/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 02/20/1990
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/20/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/20/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/14/1990
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 03/14/1990
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/14/1990
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 03/14/1990
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/14/1990
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/14/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/14/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/14/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/14/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 03/14/1990
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/27/1990
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 03/27/1990
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 03/27/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/27/1990
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 03/27/1990
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 03/27/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/27/1990
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 03/27/1990
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 03/27/1990
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 03/27/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/29/1990
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 03/29/1990
Rep. Douglas, Chuck [R-NH-2] 03/29/1990
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 03/29/1990
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 03/29/1990
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 03/29/1990
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 04/04/1990
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 04/04/1990
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 04/04/1990
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/04/1990
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 04/04/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/04/1990
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 04/18/1990
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 04/18/1990
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 04/18/1990
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 04/18/1990
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 04/18/1990
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 04/18/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 04/18/1990
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/18/1990
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 04/25/1990
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/25/1990
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/09/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 05/09/1990
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 05/09/1990
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/09/1990
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/23/1990
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 05/23/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/23/1990
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 05/23/1990
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 05/23/1990
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 05/23/1990
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 05/23/1990
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 06/06/1990
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 06/06/1990
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/06/1990
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 06/06/1990
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 06/20/1990
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 06/20/1990
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 06/20/1990
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/10/1990
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 07/10/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/10/1990
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 07/10/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 07/10/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 07/10/1990
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 07/10/1990
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 07/18/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 07/18/1990
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 07/18/1990
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 07/25/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 07/25/1990
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 07/25/1990
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 07/25/1990
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/13/1990
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 09/13/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 09/13/1990
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 09/13/1990