Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 05/24/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 05/24/1990
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 05/24/1990
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 05/24/1990
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 05/24/1990
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 06/12/1990
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 06/12/1990
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 06/12/1990
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 06/12/1990
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 06/12/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/12/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 06/12/1990
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 06/12/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/12/1990
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 06/12/1990
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 06/12/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 06/12/1990
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/12/1990
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/12/1990
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/12/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/12/1990
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/12/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/12/1990
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/12/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 06/12/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 06/12/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/12/1990
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/12/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/12/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 06/12/1990
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/12/1990
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 06/12/1990
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 06/12/1990
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 06/12/1990
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 06/12/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 06/12/1990
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/21/1990
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 06/21/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/21/1990
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 06/21/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 06/21/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/21/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/21/1990
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 08/01/1990
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 08/01/1990
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 08/01/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 08/01/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 08/01/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 08/01/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/11/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 09/11/1990
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 09/11/1990
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 09/11/1990
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 09/11/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 09/11/1990
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 09/11/1990
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 09/11/1990
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 09/11/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 09/19/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 09/19/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 09/19/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 09/19/1990
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/19/1990
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 09/19/1990
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 09/19/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 09/19/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 09/19/1990
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 09/19/1990
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 09/19/1990
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 09/19/1990
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 09/19/1990
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 09/19/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 09/19/1990
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 09/19/1990
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 09/19/1990
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 09/24/1990
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 09/24/1990
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 09/24/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/24/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 09/26/1990
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/26/1990
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 10/15/1990
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 10/15/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/15/1990
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 10/15/1990
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 10/15/1990