Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 06/12/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/12/1990
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 06/13/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/14/1990
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/14/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/14/1990
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 06/14/1990
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/14/1990
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/19/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 06/19/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 06/19/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/20/1990
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/20/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 06/20/1990
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 06/20/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/21/1990
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 06/28/1990
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/28/1990
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 06/28/1990
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/28/1990
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/28/1990
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 07/11/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 07/11/1990
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/18/1990
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 07/24/1990
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/26/1990