Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/11/1990
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/11/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/11/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 07/11/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/11/1990
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 07/17/1990
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 07/17/1990
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/17/1990
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 07/17/1990
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 07/25/1990
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 07/25/1990
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/25/1990
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 07/25/1990
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 09/13/1990
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 09/13/1990
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/13/1990
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 09/13/1990
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/13/1990
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 09/13/1990
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/13/1990
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 09/13/1990
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 09/13/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 09/13/1990
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 09/13/1990
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 09/13/1990
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/13/1990
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 09/13/1990
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 09/13/1990
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/13/1990
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 09/13/1990
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 09/13/1990
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 09/13/1990
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 09/13/1990
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/13/1990
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 09/13/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 09/13/1990
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/13/1990
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 09/13/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/13/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 09/13/1990
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 09/13/1990
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 09/13/1990
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 09/13/1990
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/13/1990
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 09/13/1990
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/13/1990
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2] 09/13/1990
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 09/13/1990
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/13/1990
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/13/1990
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/13/1990
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 09/13/1990
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/13/1990
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 09/13/1990
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 09/13/1990
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 09/13/1990
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 09/13/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 09/13/1990
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 09/13/1990
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/13/1990
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/13/1990
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 09/13/1990
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 09/13/1990
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/13/1990
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 09/13/1990
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 09/13/1990
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 09/13/1990
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/13/1990
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 09/13/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 09/13/1990
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 09/13/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 09/13/1990
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 09/13/1990
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 09/13/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 09/13/1990
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 09/13/1990
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 09/13/1990
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/13/1990
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 09/13/1990
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 09/13/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/13/1990
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 09/13/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/13/1990
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/13/1990
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 09/13/1990
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 09/13/1990
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/13/1990
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 09/13/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 09/13/1990
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/13/1990
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/13/1990
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/13/1990
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 09/13/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 09/13/1990
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 09/13/1990
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 09/13/1990
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 09/13/1990
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/13/1990
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 09/13/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 09/13/1990
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 09/13/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 09/13/1990
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 09/13/1990
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/13/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 09/18/1990
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 09/18/1990
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 09/18/1990
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 09/18/1990
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 09/18/1990
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 09/27/1990
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/27/1990
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 09/27/1990
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/27/1990
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/28/1990
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 09/28/1990
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/28/1990
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/02/1990
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 10/03/1990
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 10/03/1990
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 10/03/1990
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 10/03/1990
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/11/1990
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 10/11/1990
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/11/1990
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 10/11/1990
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 10/11/1990
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 10/11/1990
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 10/11/1990