Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 07/20/1990
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 07/20/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/27/1990
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 07/27/1990
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 07/27/1990
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 07/27/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 07/27/1990
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/27/1990
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/27/1990
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 07/27/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 07/27/1990
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 07/27/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/27/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 07/27/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 07/27/1990
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/27/1990
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/27/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/27/1990
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/27/1990
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 07/27/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 07/27/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/27/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 07/27/1990
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 08/01/1990
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 08/01/1990
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 08/01/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 08/01/1990
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 08/01/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 08/01/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 08/01/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 08/01/1990
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 08/01/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 08/01/1990
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 08/01/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 08/01/1990
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 08/01/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/11/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 09/11/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/11/1990
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 09/11/1990
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 09/11/1990
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 09/11/1990
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/17/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 09/24/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/24/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 09/24/1990
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/24/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 10/02/1990
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/11/1990
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 10/11/1990
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 10/11/1990
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 10/11/1990
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/11/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 10/17/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 10/24/1990