Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 09/19/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 10/20/1990
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 10/20/1990
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 10/20/1990
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 10/20/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 10/20/1990
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 10/20/1990
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 10/20/1990
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 10/20/1990
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/20/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 10/20/1990
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/20/1990
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 10/20/1990
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 10/20/1990
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/20/1990
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 10/20/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 10/20/1990
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/20/1990
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 10/20/1990
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 10/20/1990
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/20/1990
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 10/20/1990
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 10/20/1990
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 10/20/1990
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 10/20/1990
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 10/20/1990
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/20/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 10/20/1990
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/20/1990
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 10/20/1990
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 10/20/1990
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/20/1990
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 10/20/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 10/20/1990
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 10/20/1990
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 10/20/1990
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 10/20/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 10/20/1990
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 10/20/1990
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/20/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 10/20/1990
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 10/20/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 10/20/1990
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/20/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 10/20/1990
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/20/1990
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/20/1990
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 10/20/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 10/20/1990
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 10/20/1990
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/20/1990
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 10/20/1990
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 10/20/1990
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/20/1990
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 10/20/1990
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 10/20/1990
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/20/1990
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 10/20/1990
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 10/20/1990
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 10/20/1990
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/20/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 10/20/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 10/20/1990
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 10/20/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 10/20/1990
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 10/20/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/20/1990
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/20/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/20/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 10/20/1990
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/20/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 10/20/1990
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 10/20/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/20/1990
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/20/1990
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/20/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 10/20/1990
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 10/20/1990
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 10/20/1990
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 10/20/1990
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 10/20/1990
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 10/20/1990
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 10/20/1990
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 10/20/1990
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 10/20/1990
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 10/22/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 10/22/1990
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/22/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 10/22/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 10/22/1990
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 10/22/1990
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/22/1990
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 10/22/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 10/22/1990
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/22/1990
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 10/22/1990
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/22/1990
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/22/1990
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 10/22/1990
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 10/22/1990
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 10/22/1990
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 10/22/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 10/22/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 10/22/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 10/22/1990
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 10/22/1990
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 10/22/1990
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 10/22/1990
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/22/1990
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 10/24/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 10/24/1990
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 10/24/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 10/24/1990
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 10/24/1990
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 10/24/1990
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 10/24/1990
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 10/24/1990
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 10/24/1990
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 10/24/1990
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 10/24/1990
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/24/1990
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 10/24/1990