Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 10/17/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 10/21/1990
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/21/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 10/21/1990
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 10/21/1990
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 10/21/1990
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/21/1990
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 10/21/1990
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 10/21/1990
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 10/21/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 10/21/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 10/21/1990
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 10/21/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/21/1990
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 10/21/1990
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/21/1990
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 10/21/1990
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 10/21/1990
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 10/21/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 10/21/1990
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 10/21/1990
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 10/21/1990
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 10/21/1990
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 10/21/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 10/21/1990
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 10/21/1990
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 10/21/1990
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 10/21/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 10/21/1990
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/21/1990
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 10/21/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 10/21/1990
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 10/21/1990
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 10/21/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 10/21/1990
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 10/21/1990
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/21/1990
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 10/21/1990
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 10/21/1990
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 10/21/1990
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 10/21/1990
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 10/21/1990
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 10/21/1990
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 10/21/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 10/21/1990
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 10/21/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 10/21/1990
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/21/1990
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/21/1990
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/21/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 10/21/1990
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 10/21/1990
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 10/21/1990
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/21/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 10/21/1990
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 10/21/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/21/1990
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 10/21/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/21/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 10/22/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 10/22/1990
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 10/22/1990
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 10/22/1990
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 10/22/1990
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 10/22/1990
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 10/22/1990
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 10/22/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 10/22/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 10/22/1990
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/22/1990
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 10/22/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/22/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 10/22/1990
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 10/22/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 10/22/1990
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 10/22/1990
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 10/22/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 10/22/1990
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 10/22/1990
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 10/22/1990
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 10/24/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 10/24/1990
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 10/24/1990
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 10/24/1990
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 10/24/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/24/1990
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/25/1990
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 10/25/1990
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 10/25/1990
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 10/25/1990