Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 02/23/1989
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 02/23/1989
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/23/1989
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/23/1989
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 02/23/1989
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 02/23/1989
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/23/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 02/23/1989
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 02/23/1989
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/05/1989
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 04/05/1989
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 04/05/1989
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 04/05/1989
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/05/1989
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/05/1989
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 04/05/1989
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 04/05/1989
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 04/05/1989
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 04/10/1989
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 04/10/1989
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/10/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 04/10/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/12/1989
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 04/12/1989
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 04/12/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 04/12/1989
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 04/13/1989
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 04/13/1989
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 05/10/1989
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 05/10/1989
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/18/1989
Rep. Smith, Larkin [R-MS-5] 07/24/1989
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 07/25/1989
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/25/1989
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 07/26/1989
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 07/26/1989
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 07/27/1989
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 08/02/1989
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 08/02/1989
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/12/1989
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 09/12/1989
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 09/12/1989
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 09/12/1989
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/12/1989
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 01/24/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/24/1990
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 02/28/1990
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/08/1990
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 05/08/1990
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 05/16/1990
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 07/10/1990