Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 05/16/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2]* 05/16/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 05/16/1989
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 05/16/1989
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 05/23/1989
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/23/1989
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 05/23/1989
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/23/1989
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 05/23/1989
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/23/1989
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 05/23/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/23/1989
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/23/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/23/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 05/23/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/23/1989
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/23/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/23/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/23/1989
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/23/1989
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 05/23/1989
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/23/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/23/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 05/23/1989
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 05/23/1989
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/23/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 05/23/1989
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 05/23/1989
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 05/23/1989
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 05/23/1989
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 05/23/1989
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 05/23/1989
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 05/23/1989
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/23/1989
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/23/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/23/1989
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/23/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/23/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/23/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/05/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/05/1989
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/05/1989
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 06/05/1989
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 06/05/1989
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 06/05/1989
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 06/05/1989
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/05/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 06/05/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/05/1989
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 06/05/1989
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 06/05/1989
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/05/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 06/14/1989
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/14/1989
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 06/14/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 06/14/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 06/14/1989
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 06/14/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 06/21/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 06/21/1989
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 06/21/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 07/24/1989
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 07/24/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 07/24/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 08/01/1989