There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making the official expenses allowance of Members of the House of Representatives available for printing and production of newsletters containing directories of State, local, and nonprofit private programs that provide drug counseling, treatment, and information.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/19/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/19/1989Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
07/19/1989Introduced in House

Cosponsors (148)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/26/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/26/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 07/26/1989
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/26/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 07/26/1989
Rep. Smith, Larkin [R-MS-5] 07/26/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 07/26/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 08/04/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 08/04/1989
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 08/04/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 08/04/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 08/04/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 08/04/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 08/04/1989
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 08/04/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 08/04/1989
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/13/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 09/13/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/13/1989
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 09/13/1989
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 09/13/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 09/13/1989
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 09/13/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/13/1989
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 09/13/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/13/1989
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 09/13/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 09/13/1989
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/13/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 09/13/1989
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 09/13/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/13/1989
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 09/13/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/13/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 09/13/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/13/1989
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 09/13/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 09/27/1989
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/27/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 09/27/1989
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/27/1989
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/27/1989
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 09/27/1989
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/27/1989
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/27/1989
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 09/27/1989
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/27/1989
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/27/1989
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/27/1989
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 09/27/1989
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 09/27/1989
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 09/27/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 09/27/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 10/11/1989
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 10/11/1989
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/11/1989
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 10/11/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/11/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 10/11/1989
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 10/11/1989
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 10/11/1989
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 10/11/1989
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/11/1989
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 10/11/1989
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 10/11/1989
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 10/11/1989
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 10/30/1989
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/30/1989
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 10/30/1989
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 10/30/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 10/30/1989
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 10/30/1989
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 10/30/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 10/30/1989
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 10/30/1989
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 10/30/1989
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/30/1989
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/30/1989
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 10/30/1989
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 10/30/1989
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/30/1989
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20] 10/30/1989
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/30/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 10/30/1989
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/30/1989
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/30/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/30/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 10/30/1989
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 10/30/1989
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 10/30/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/30/1989
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 10/30/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/30/1989
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 10/30/1989
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/30/1989
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 10/30/1989
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 10/30/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 10/30/1989
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 11/15/1989
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 11/15/1989
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 11/15/1989
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/15/1989
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 11/15/1989
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 11/15/1989
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 11/15/1989
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 11/15/1989
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 11/15/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 11/15/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 11/15/1989
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 11/15/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 11/15/1989
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 11/15/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 11/15/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 11/15/1989
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 11/15/1989
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 11/15/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 11/20/1989
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 11/20/1989
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 11/20/1989
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 11/20/1989
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 11/20/1989
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 11/20/1989
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 11/20/1989
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 11/20/1989
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 11/20/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/20/1989
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/20/1989
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 11/20/1989
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 11/20/1989
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 11/20/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 01/24/1990
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 01/24/1990
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/24/1990
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 01/24/1990
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 01/24/1990
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 01/24/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 01/24/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 01/24/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 01/24/1990
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 02/21/1990
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 02/21/1990
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/21/1990
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/21/1990
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 02/21/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 02/21/1990
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/21/1990

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration07/19/1989 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.206.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.206. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/19/1989)

Authorizes the use of the official expenses allowance of each Member of the House of Representatives for production of newsletters containing directories of State, local, and nonprofit private drug counseling, treatment, and information programs.