Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 09/25/1990
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 09/25/1990
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 09/25/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 09/25/1990
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 09/25/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 09/25/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 09/25/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 09/25/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 10/10/1990
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 10/10/1990
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 10/10/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 10/10/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/10/1990
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 10/10/1990
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 10/10/1990
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/10/1990
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 10/10/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 10/10/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/10/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 10/10/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 10/10/1990
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 10/10/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 10/16/1990
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/16/1990
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 10/16/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 10/16/1990
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 10/16/1990
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/16/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 10/16/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/16/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 10/16/1990
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 10/16/1990
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 10/16/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 10/16/1990
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 10/22/1990
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/22/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 10/22/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 10/23/1990
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 10/26/1990