Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 05/18/1989
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 05/31/1989
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/07/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/13/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/13/1989
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/13/1989
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/20/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/20/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/11/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 07/12/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 08/03/1989