Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/31/1989
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 06/15/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/15/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/22/1989
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/22/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 07/27/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 08/03/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 08/04/1989
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/19/1989
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 09/19/1989
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 09/19/1989
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/19/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 10/04/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/18/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/18/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 02/20/1990
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 02/20/1990
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/09/1990
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/03/1990
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 06/06/1990