There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Environmental Education Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

National Environmental Education Act

Short Titles as Introduced

National Environmental Education Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to increase public understanding of the natural environment and to advance and develop environmental education and training.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/18/1990Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
05/11/1990Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Burdick with amendments. With written report No. 101-284.
05/18/1989Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/05/1991SenateSee also S. 3176.
08/17/1990HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Select Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
07/24/1990HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
07/24/1990-5:58pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/24/1990SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/18/1990SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
07/18/1990SenateS.Amdt.2302 Amendment SP 2302 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
07/18/1990SenateS.Amdt.2302 Proposed by Senator Cranston for Senator Burdick. Of a technical nature.
07/18/1990SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
05/11/1990SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 541.
05/11/1990SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Burdick with amendments. With written report No. 101-284.
04/24/1990SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
02/01/1990SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 101-585.
05/18/1989SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/19/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 06/19/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/19/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/19/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 01/25/1990
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 01/25/1990
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 01/25/1990
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 01/25/1990
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/07/1990
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/07/1990
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/07/1990
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/14/1990
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/21/1990
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/31/1990

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works05/18/1989 Referred to
02/01/1990 Hearings by
04/24/1990 Markup by
05/11/1990 Reported by S.Rept 101-284
House Education and Labor07/24/1990 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Select Education08/17/1990 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1076. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/18/1990)

National Environmental Education Act - Directs the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to establish an Office of Environmental Education within EPA to carry out this Act.

Establishes an Environmental Education and Training Program to train educational professionals in the development and delivery of environmental education and training programs and studies. Directs the Administrator to make an annual grant to an institution of higher education or nonprofit institution to operate such program. Sets forth application and eligibility requirements and criteria to be considered in awarding such grants.

Authorizes the Administrator to enter into cooperative agreements or provide grants to support projects to design, demonstrate, or disseminate practices related to environmental education and training. Outlines activities eligible for grant support and priorities in awarding such grants. Requires the Administrator to publish an annual solicitation for environmental education grants. Authorizes local education agencies, colleges or universities, nonprofit agencies, or noncommercial broadcasting entities to apply for such grants. Limits Federal funds for demonstration projects to 75 percent of the total cost, except in specified instances. Limits such grants to $150,000 and requires 25 percent of all funds obligated to be for grants of no more than $5,000.

Requires the Administrator to provide for internships by postsecondary students and fellowships for in-service teachers with Federal agencies involved in environmental issues. Directs the Administrator, to the extent practicable, to support at least 250 internships and 50 fellowships annually. Makes eligible for participation in such program: (1) students enrolled at accredited colleges or universities who have successfully completed at least four courses or the equivalent in environmental studies; and (2) in-service teachers who are currently employed by local educational agencies and have at least two years' experience in teaching environmental education, environmental sciences, or related courses.

Requires the Administrator to provide for a series of national awards recognizing outstanding contributions to environmental education to include: (1) the Theodore Roosevelt Award for environmental teaching or administration; (2) the Henry David Thoreau Award for literature on the environment and pollution problems; (3) the Rachel Carson Award for film, broadcast, or print media for public education and information on environmental issues or problems; and (4) the Gifford Pinchot Award for multiple use and sustained yield land management. Provides that recipients of such awards shall be nominated by the Environmental Education Advisory Council. Authorizes the Administrator to provide for the President's Environmental Youth Awards to be given to young people in grades kindergarten through twelfth for outstanding projects to promote local environmental awareness. Permits the regional administrator of each EPA office to present an "Outstanding Environmental Educator Award" annually to a teacher or faculty member from a local education agency, college or university, or nonprofit organization in recognition of an outstanding contribution to environmental education.

Establishes a National Environmental Education Advisory Council and Federal Task Force on Environmental Education. Requires the Council to report biennially to the Congress on: (1) the extent and quality of national environmental education; (2) activities conducted pursuant to this Act; (3) obstacles to improving environmental education; and (4) training and skills needed to respond to environmental problems.

Establishes the Environmental Education Trust Fund. Requires 50 percent of penalties received under specified environmental Acts to be deposited in the Fund. Limits the total amount of deposits to the Fund in any fiscal year.

Authorizes and allocates appropriations.