Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/18/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/19/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 06/19/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/19/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/19/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 01/25/1990
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 01/25/1990
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 01/25/1990
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 01/25/1990
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/07/1990
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/07/1990
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/07/1990
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/14/1990
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/21/1990
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/31/1990