Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 06/23/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/21/1989
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 09/21/1989
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/21/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 09/21/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/29/1989
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 10/31/1989
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 03/22/1990
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 03/28/1990
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/29/1990
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/02/1990
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 04/19/1990
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 04/19/1990
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/11/1990
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 05/11/1990
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/23/1990
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 06/14/1990
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/14/1990
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/14/1990
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/20/1990
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/21/1990
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/26/1990
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/26/1990
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 07/10/1990
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 07/10/1990
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 08/03/1990
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 08/03/1990
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 08/03/1990
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 08/03/1990
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 08/03/1990
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 08/04/1990
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 09/10/1990
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 10/04/1990