Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 07/13/1989
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 07/13/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 07/13/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 07/13/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 07/13/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 07/13/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 07/13/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/13/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 07/13/1989
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 07/13/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 07/13/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 07/13/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/26/1989
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 07/27/1989
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 08/04/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/20/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 10/17/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 10/17/1989
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 10/31/1989
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 10/31/1989
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/07/1989
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/07/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 11/07/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 11/07/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 11/13/1989
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 11/15/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/15/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 11/16/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 11/21/1989
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 01/24/1990
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/24/1990
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 01/30/1990
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 02/05/1990
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 02/05/1990
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 02/05/1990
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/06/1990
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/06/1990
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 02/06/1990
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/06/1990
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/07/1990