Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 08/03/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/03/1989
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 08/03/1989
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 10/05/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/18/1989
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 10/18/1989
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/18/1989
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 10/18/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/31/1989
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/31/1989
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 04/03/1990