Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 07/20/1989
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 07/20/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 07/20/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 07/20/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 07/20/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 07/20/1989
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA]* 07/20/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 07/20/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 07/20/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/31/1989
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/04/1989
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 08/04/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 09/12/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 09/12/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 09/14/1989