Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 07/27/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 07/27/1989
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 07/27/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/27/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/27/1989
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 07/27/1989
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 07/27/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 07/27/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 07/27/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 07/27/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/06/1989
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 09/06/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/13/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 09/18/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 09/18/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 09/18/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 10/16/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 11/07/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/07/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/07/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 11/09/1989
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 11/16/1989
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 01/23/1990
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 01/23/1990
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 01/24/1990
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 01/29/1990
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 01/31/1990
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 02/01/1990
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 02/05/1990
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 02/05/1990
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/05/1990
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/06/1990
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/06/1990
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/06/1990
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 02/08/1990
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/20/1990
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/26/1990
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 03/01/1990