Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 08/03/1989
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 08/03/1989
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 08/03/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 08/03/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 08/03/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/18/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 09/27/1989
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 09/29/1989
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 09/29/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 11/06/1989
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 11/16/1989
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 11/16/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/23/1990
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/06/1990
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/20/1990
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/20/1990
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 02/20/1990
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/21/1990
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/01/1990
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 03/01/1990
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/01/1990
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 03/22/1990
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 03/27/1990
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/03/1990
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 04/05/1990
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 04/05/1990
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/19/1990
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/23/1990
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 04/25/1990
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 04/25/1990
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/01/1990
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/02/1990
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/14/1990
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 05/21/1990
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/23/1990
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/23/1990
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/24/1990
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/06/1990
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 06/07/1990
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 06/08/1990
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/25/1990
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/28/1990
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 09/14/1990
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 09/14/1990
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/17/1990