There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act so as to include Lake Champlain in the Clean Lakes Demonstration Program.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/22/1989Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
11/20/1989Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Moynihan without amendment. Without written report.
08/04/1989Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
11/16/1990HouseSee H.R.4323 (Title III).
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
12/06/1989HouseExecutive Comment Requested from EPA, OMB.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
12/04/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
11/22/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
11/22/1989-3:32amHouseReceived in the House.
11/22/1989SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
11/22/1989SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/20/1989SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 407.
11/20/1989SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Moynihan without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
11/16/1989SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
08/04/1989SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 08/04/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 08/04/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 08/04/1989

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works08/04/1989 Referred to
11/16/1989 Markup by
11/20/1989 Reported by
House Public Works and Transportation11/22/1989 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Water Resources12/04/1989 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1539.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1539. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (08/04/1989)

Amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to include Lake Champlain, New York and Vermont, in the Clean Lakes demonstration program.