Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 11/02/1989
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 01/23/1990
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 01/23/1990
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 01/23/1990
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 01/23/1990
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 01/23/1990
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 01/23/1990
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 01/29/1990
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 01/29/1990
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 01/29/1990
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/29/1990
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 01/29/1990
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/29/1990
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 01/29/1990
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 01/31/1990
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 01/31/1990
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/05/1990
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 02/05/1990
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 02/05/1990
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/07/1990
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/07/1990
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/07/1990
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 02/07/1990
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 02/21/1990
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/28/1990
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 02/28/1990
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 02/28/1990
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/07/1990
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/09/1990
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/09/1990
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/09/1990
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/20/1990
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/22/1990
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/19/1990
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/19/1990
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 04/24/1990
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/24/1990
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 05/17/1990
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 05/17/1990
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 05/18/1990
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/18/1990
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 05/21/1990
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/23/1990
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/05/1990
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 06/05/1990
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 07/26/1990