Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 09/27/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 09/27/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/03/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/03/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/16/1989
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/10/1990
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 09/12/1990