There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Global Change Research Act of 1990

Short Titles as Enacted for portions of this bill
  • International Cooperation in Global Change Research Act of 1990

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Global Change Research Act of 1990

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

National Global Change Research Act of 1989

Short Titles as Introduced

National Global Change Research Act of 1989

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the National Science and Technology Policy, Organization, and Priorities Act of 1976 in order to provide for improved coordination of national scientific research efforts and to provide for a national plan to improve scientific understanding of the Earth system and the effect of changes in that system on climate and human well-being.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
11/16/1990Became Public Law No: 101-606.
11/16/1990Signed by President.
11/16/1990Became Public Law No. 101-606
11/09/1990Presented to President.
10/28/1990Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment by Voice Vote.
10/26/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
02/06/1990Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 100-0. Record Vote No: 5.
05/31/1989Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Hollings with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 101-40.
01/25/1989Introduced in Senate

All Actions (33)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/16/1990Became Public Law No: 101-606.
11/16/1990Signed by President.
11/16/1990Became Public Law No. 101-606
11/09/1990SenatePresented to President.
11/09/1990SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
11/07/1990SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/28/1990SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment by Voice Vote.
10/27/1990SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
10/26/1990-11:48pmHouseThe Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of S. 169.
10/26/1990-11:47pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/26/1990-11:46pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
10/26/1990-11:45pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/26/1990-11:38pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/26/1990-11:38pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
10/26/1990-11:38pmHouseOn ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
10/26/1990-11:38pmHouseMr. Walker demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
10/26/1990-11:37pmHouseMr. Brown (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/05/1990HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Natural Resources, Agriculture Research, and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space and Technology
03/05/1990HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on International Scientific Cooperation.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space and Technology
02/22/1990HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space and Technology.
02/20/1990-2:39pmHouseHeld at the desk.
02/20/1990-2:39pmHouseReceived in the House.
02/20/1990SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/06/1990SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 100-0. Record Vote No: 5.
02/06/1990SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Voice Vote.
02/06/1990SenateS.Amdt.1232 Amendment agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
02/06/1990SenateS.Amdt.1232 Proposed by Senator Hollings. To make an amendment in the nature of a substitute.
02/06/1990SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
05/31/1989SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 78.
05/31/1989SenateCommittee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Hollings with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 101-40.
04/18/1989SenateCommittee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
02/22/1989SenateCommittee on Commerce. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 101-32.
01/25/1989SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.

Cosponsors (26)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation01/25/1989 Referred to
02/22/1989 Hearings by
04/18/1989 Markup by
05/31/1989 Reported by S.Rept 101-40
House Science, Space and Technology02/22/1990 Referred to
House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on International Scientific Cooperation03/05/1990 Referred to
House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on Natural Resources, Agriculture Research and Environment03/05/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.169.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.169. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/26/1990)

Global Change Research Act of 1990 - Title I: United States Global Change Research Program - Directs the President, through the Federal Coordinating Council on Science, Engineering, and Technology (Council), to establish the Committee on Earth and Environmental Sciences to carry out Council functions under specified provisions of the National Science and Technology Policy, Organization, and Priorities Act of 1976 relating to global change research, to increase the effectiveness and productivity of Federal global change research efforts.

Directs the President to establish an interagency United States Global Change Research Program to improve understanding of global change.

Requires the Chairman of the Council, through the Committee, to develop a National Global Change Research Plan for implementation of the Program. Sets forth required Plan contents and research elements, including that the Plan provide recommendations for collaboration within the Federal Government and among nations. Requires the Chairman to enter into an agreement with the National Research Council to: (1) evaluate the scientific content of the Plan; and (2) provide information and advice and recommended priorities for future global change research.

Requires the Committee to provide general guidance each year to each Federal agency or department participating in the Program with respect to preparation of requests for appropriations related to the Program.

Requires the Council, at least every four years, through the Committee, to submit to the President and the Congress an assessment regarding the findings of the Program and associated uncertainties, the effects of global change, and current and major long-term trends in global change.

Requires that the research findings of the Committee and of Federal agencies and departments be made available to the Environmental Protection Agency and all Federal agencies and departments.

Title II: International Cooperation in Global Change Research - International Cooperation in Global Change Research Act of 1990 - Declares that the President should direct the Secretary of State to initiate discussions with other nations on: (1) international agreements to coordinate global change research; and (2) an international research protocol for cooperation on the development of energy technologies which have minimally adverse effects on the environment.

Directs the President to establish an Office of Global Change Research Information to disseminate to foreign governments and their citizens, businesses, and institutions scientific research useful in preventing, mitigating, or adapting to the effects of global change.

Title III: Growth Decision Aid - Directs the Secretary of Commerce to: (1) conduct a study on the implications of growth and development on urban, suburban, and rural communities; and (2) based on the study, produce a decision aid to assist State and local authorities in planning and managing growth and development while preserving community character.