There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Ponca Restoration Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Ponca Restoration Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Ponca Restoration Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Ponca Restoration Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Ponca Restoration Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the restoration of Federal recognition to the Ponca Tribe of Nebraska, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
10/31/1990Became Public Law No: 101-484.
10/31/1990Signed by President.
10/24/1990Presented to President.
10/16/1990Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
10/10/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/01/1990Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. H. Rept. 101-776.
07/18/1990Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
06/12/1990Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Inouye with amendments. With written report No. 101-330.
10/11/1989Introduced in Senate

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/31/1990Became Public Law No: 101-484.
10/31/1990Signed by President.
10/24/1990SenatePresented to President.
10/23/1990SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/17/1990SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/16/1990SenateSenate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
10/12/1990SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
10/10/1990-3:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/10/1990-3:26pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/10/1990-3:19pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/10/1990HouseThe chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
10/10/1990-3:19pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
10/10/1990-3:18pmHouseMr. Campbell (CO) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/01/1990HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 485.
10/01/1990HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. H. Rept. 101-776.
09/26/1990HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
09/26/1990HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
09/13/1990HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
07/23/1990SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/23/1990HouseReferred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
07/23/1990-12:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/18/1990SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
06/12/1990SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 605.
06/12/1990SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Inouye with amendments. With written report No. 101-330.
05/01/1990SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
03/28/1990SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 101-762.
10/11/1989SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 10/11/1989

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs (Permanent Select)10/11/1989 Referred to
03/28/1990 Hearings by
05/01/1990 Markup by
06/12/1990 Reported by S.Rept 101-330
House Interior and Insular Affairs07/23/1990 Referred to
09/13/1990 Hearings by
09/26/1990 Markup by
10/01/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-776

No related bill information was received for S.1747.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1747. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/10/1990)

Ponca Restoration Act - Extends Federal recognition and associated benefits to the Ponca Tribe of Nebraska. Deems members of the Tribe in certain counties in Nebraska and South Dakota as residing on or near a reservation for purposes of receiving the benefits available to members of federally recognized tribes residing on or near a reservation.

Provides for the Tribe to be governed by an Interim Council until the Secretary of the Interior conducts elections to adopt a constitution and elect tribal officials.