Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/25/1989
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 10/25/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 10/25/1989
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/26/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/31/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/31/1989
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 11/07/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/07/1989
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 11/09/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 11/14/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 11/14/1989
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 11/17/1989
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/20/1989
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 11/21/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 01/23/1990
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 01/23/1990
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 01/30/1990
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/05/1990
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/08/1990
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/27/1990
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 03/05/1990
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 03/06/1990
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/20/1990
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/27/1990
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/27/1990
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 04/19/1990
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 04/19/1990
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/24/1990
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 04/27/1990
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/17/1990