Committees: S.1813 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs (Permanent Select)10/31/1989 Referred to
11/09/1989 Markup by
11/15/1989 Reported by S.Rept 101-207
House Energy and Commerce11/17/1989 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment12/05/1989 Referred to
House Interior and Insular Affairs11/17/1989 Referred to
03/21/1990 Markup by
03/27/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-432 Part 1