Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 11/03/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 11/03/1989
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 11/03/1989
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 11/03/1989
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 11/03/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 11/03/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 11/03/1989
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 11/14/1989
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 11/14/1989
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 11/14/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 11/14/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/14/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 11/14/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 01/23/1990
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 01/23/1990
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 01/29/1990
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/05/1990
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/06/1990