There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to award a Congressional Gold Medal to Laurance Spelman Rockefeller.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
05/17/1990Became Public Law No: 101-296.
05/17/1990Signed by President.
05/10/1990Presented to President.
05/01/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
03/26/1990Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
03/21/1990Committee on Banking. Reported to Senate by Senator Riegle without amendment. Without written report.
11/08/1989Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
05/17/1990Became Public Law No: 101-296.
05/17/1990Signed by President.
05/10/1990SenatePresented to President.
05/10/1990SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
05/01/1990-6:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/01/1990-6:29pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
05/01/1990-6:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
05/01/1990HouseThe chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
05/01/1990-6:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
05/01/1990-6:21pmHouseMr. Lehman (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/16/1990HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Affairs and Coinage.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs
03/27/1990SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/27/1990HouseReferred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
03/27/1990-1:04pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/26/1990SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
03/26/1990SenateS.Amdt.1379 Amendment SP 1379 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
03/26/1990SenateS.Amdt.1379 Proposed by Senator Dole for Senator Chafee. To make a technical correction to S. 1853.
03/26/1990SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
03/21/1990SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 484.
03/21/1990SenateCommittee on Banking. Reported to Senate by Senator Riegle without amendment. Without written report.
03/20/1990SenateCommittee on Banking. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
11/08/1989SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking.

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 11/08/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 11/08/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 11/08/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 11/08/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 11/08/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 11/08/1989
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 11/08/1989
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 11/08/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 11/08/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 11/20/1989
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 02/20/1990
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/20/1990
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/20/1990
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 02/20/1990
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/20/1990
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/20/1990
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 02/20/1990
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 02/22/1990
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/22/1990
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 02/22/1990
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 02/26/1990
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/26/1990
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/26/1990
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/26/1990
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/26/1990
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/26/1990
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/26/1990
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 02/27/1990
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/27/1990
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/27/1990
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/27/1990
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 02/27/1990
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 02/27/1990
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 02/27/1990
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/27/1990
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/28/1990
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 02/28/1990
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 02/28/1990
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 02/28/1990
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 03/01/1990
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/01/1990
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/01/1990
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 03/01/1990
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/06/1990
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/06/1990
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 03/07/1990
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/07/1990
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/07/1990
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 03/09/1990
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/09/1990
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 03/20/1990
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 03/22/1990
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 03/22/1990
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 03/22/1990
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/26/1990
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/26/1990

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs11/08/1989 Referred to
03/20/1990 Markup by
03/21/1990 Reported by
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs03/27/1990 Referred to
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs Subcommittee on Consumer Affairs and Coinage04/16/1990 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1853. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (03/26/1990)

Authorizes the President, on behalf of the Congress, to present a gold medal to Laurance Spelman Rockefeller in recognition of his leadership on behalf of natural resource conservation and historic preservation. Authorizes appropriations.

Authorizes the Secretary of the Treasury to provide for the sale of bronze duplicates of the medal.