Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 11/08/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 11/08/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 11/08/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 11/08/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 11/08/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 11/08/1989
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 11/08/1989
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 11/08/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 11/08/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 11/20/1989
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 02/20/1990
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/20/1990
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/20/1990
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 02/20/1990
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/20/1990
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/20/1990
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 02/20/1990
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 02/22/1990
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/22/1990
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 02/22/1990
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 02/26/1990
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/26/1990
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/26/1990
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/26/1990
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/26/1990
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/26/1990
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/26/1990
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 02/27/1990
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/27/1990
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/27/1990
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/27/1990
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 02/27/1990
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 02/27/1990
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 02/27/1990
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/27/1990
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/28/1990
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 02/28/1990
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 02/28/1990
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 02/28/1990
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 03/01/1990
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/01/1990
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/01/1990
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 03/01/1990
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/06/1990
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/06/1990
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 03/07/1990
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/07/1990
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/07/1990
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 03/09/1990
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/09/1990
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 03/20/1990
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 03/22/1990
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 03/22/1990
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 03/22/1990
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/26/1990
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/26/1990