Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 11/16/1989
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 11/16/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 11/20/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 11/20/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 11/21/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 01/23/1990
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/23/1990
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 01/23/1990
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 01/23/1990
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 01/23/1990
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 01/23/1990
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/20/1990
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 02/20/1990
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/20/1990
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/20/1990
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 02/20/1990
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/20/1990
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 02/22/1990
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 03/06/1990
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/06/1990
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 03/06/1990
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/06/1990
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 03/06/1990
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 03/20/1990
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 03/20/1990
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/04/1990
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/05/1990
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 04/05/1990
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 04/05/1990
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 04/19/1990
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/19/1990
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/25/1990
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 04/25/1990
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 05/08/1990
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 05/08/1990
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/10/1990
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 05/22/1990
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/24/1990
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 07/10/1990
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 07/23/1990
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 07/27/1990
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 09/10/1990
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 09/11/1990
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/11/1990
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/11/1990
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/11/1990
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 09/13/1990
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 09/13/1990
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 09/13/1990
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 09/26/1990
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 10/04/1990
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 10/04/1990