There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Whistleblower Protection Act of 1989

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Whistleblower Protection Act of 1989

Short Titles as Introduced

Whistleblower Protection Act of 1989

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 5, United States Code, to strengthen the protections available to Federal employees against prohibited personnel practices, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
04/10/1989Became Public Law No: 101-12.
04/10/1989Signed by President.
04/03/1989Presented to President.
03/21/1989Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
03/16/1989Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 97-0. Record Vote No: 24.
01/25/1989Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
04/10/1989Became Public Law No: 101-12.
04/10/1989Signed by President.
04/03/1989SenatePresented to President.
03/27/1989SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
03/21/1989-1:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/21/1989-1:21pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
03/21/1989-12:52pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
03/21/1989-12:52pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
03/21/1989-12:52pmHouseOn ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
03/21/1989-12:52pmHouseMr. Horton demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
03/21/1989-12:51pmHouseMr. Sikorski moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/21/1989SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/21/1989-12:01pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/21/1989-12:01pmHouseHeld at the desk.
03/16/1989SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 97-0. Record Vote No: 24.
03/16/1989SenateS.Amdt.9 Amendment SP 9 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
03/16/1989SenateS.Amdt.9 Proposed by Senator Levin. To prohibit the Office of Special Counsel from intervening against and disclosing the name of whistleblowers in cases before the Merit Systems Protection Board, to delete the authority of the Office of Special Counsel to go to court to appeal decisions or enforce subpoenas, and to clarify that whistleblowers must show that their disclosure was a "contributing factor" in the action against them in order to prove reprisal.
03/16/1989SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
01/25/1989SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.

Committees (0)

Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.20. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (03/16/1989)

Whistleblower Protection Act of 1989 - Separates the Office of Special Counsel from the Merit Systems Protection Board. Empowers the Special Counsel to represent and act as legal counsel on behalf of employees alleging prohibited personnel practices, especially whistleblowers. Revises current law with respect to the Special Counsel to reflect its advocate status.

Authorizes the Board to grant protective orders to protect a witness or other individual from harassment either during a proceeding before the Board or during a Special Counsel investigation. Requires the Board, when it considers alternative places for conducting hearings or proceedings, to select the place closest to the location of the individual involved, unless the total administrative costs to the Government in conducting such hearings or proceedings would be less elsewhere.

Authorizes the Special Counsel to file a petition with the Board against an official for: (1) engaging in prohibited personnel practices; (2) violating a law within the jurisdiction of the Special Counsel; or (3) failing to comply with an order of the Board. Sets forth procedures for disciplining such officials.

Authorizes the Special Counsel to apply to the Board to enforce a court subpoena.

Prohibits the Special Counsel from intervening in cases without the employee's consent.

Prohibits the Special Counsel from providing information concerning any person making an allegation of a prohibited personnel practice without the consent of such person, except when necessary because of imminent danger to public health or safety or of imminent criminal act.

Prescribes procedures for the Special Counsel when disclosures are made by persons other than an employee, former employee, applicant for employment, or employee who obtained information in connection with official duties.

Requires the Special Counsel to report annually to the Congress on its activities.

Establishes requirements for the Special Counsel to make public certain information, including noncriminal matters.

Authorizes employees who have been adversely affected by a prohibited personnel practice to bring an action before the Board (instead of or in addition to taking such action to the Special Counsel).

Requires whistleblowers to show that their disclosure was a contributing factor in adverse actions against them in order to prove reprisal.

Authorizes Federal agencies to give preference in granting transfers to whistleblowers.

Provides interim relief for certain appellants to the Board.

Authorizes appropriations for the Merit Systems Protection Board for FY 1989 through 1994 and for the Office of Special Counsel for FY 1989 through 1992.