Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/23/1990
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 01/23/1990
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/23/1990
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 01/23/1990
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/23/1990
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 01/23/1990
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/23/1990
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/23/1990
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH]* 01/23/1990
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 01/23/1990
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 01/23/1990
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 01/23/1990
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/23/1990
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/23/1990
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/23/1990
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 01/30/1990
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 02/06/1990
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/06/1990
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/03/1990