Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 01/23/1990
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 01/23/1990
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 01/23/1990
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 01/23/1990
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 01/24/1990
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/03/1990
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/08/1990
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/08/1990
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 05/08/1990
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/09/1990
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/15/1990
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 05/15/1990
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 05/15/1990
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 06/28/1990