Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 01/24/1990
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 01/24/1990
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 01/24/1990
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/24/1990
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/05/1990
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/07/1990
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 02/08/1990
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/20/1990
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 02/26/1990
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 02/27/1990
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/01/1990
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 03/05/1990
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/09/1990
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 03/20/1990
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 03/20/1990
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/22/1990
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/29/1990
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/06/1990