Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/30/1990
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 01/30/1990
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 01/30/1990
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/30/1990
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 01/30/1990
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 01/30/1990
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/03/1990
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 05/16/1990
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/16/1990
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/17/1990
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/24/1990
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/24/1990
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/07/1990
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/07/1990
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/12/1990
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/18/1990
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/18/1990
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/18/1990
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/21/1990
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 06/27/1990
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/27/1990
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 07/10/1990
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 07/10/1990
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 07/13/1990
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 07/18/1990
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 07/18/1990
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/24/1990
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 08/01/1990
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 08/04/1990
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/10/1990
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/10/1990
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/12/1990
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/24/1990
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 10/04/1990
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 10/10/1990