Committees: S.2075 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs02/06/1990 Referred to
04/24/1990 Hearings by
05/01/1990 Markup by
05/16/1990 Reported by S.Rept 101-295
House Interior and Insular Affairs05/25/1990 Referred to
07/31/1990 Hearings by
09/19/1990 Markup by
09/24/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-743