Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 02/07/1990
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/07/1990
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 02/07/1990
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/28/1990
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/25/1990
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 07/12/1990
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 07/12/1990
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/24/1990
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 09/11/1990
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/11/1990
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 10/16/1990