Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/31/1989
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 01/31/1989
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 01/31/1989
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 02/02/1989
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/02/1989
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 02/28/1989
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO] 02/28/1989
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/02/1989
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/11/1989