Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 01/31/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 02/07/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/23/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/23/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/04/1989
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 05/31/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/14/1989
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 10/04/1989