Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 03/02/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/02/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 03/02/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/17/1989
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 03/17/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 03/17/1989
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/17/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 04/18/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 04/18/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 04/18/1989
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 04/18/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/18/1989
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 05/17/1989
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 05/17/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/17/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/17/1989
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/17/1989
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 06/15/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 06/15/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/21/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/21/1989
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/21/1989
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 06/21/1989
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 07/14/1989
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/14/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/14/1989
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/14/1989
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/18/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 07/18/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/18/1989
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/18/1989
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/18/1989
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/27/1989
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 07/27/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 07/27/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 07/27/1989
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 08/04/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 08/04/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/12/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/23/1989
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/23/1989