There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Smith River National Recreation Area Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Smith River National Recreation Area Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to redesignate the Sunset Crater National Monument as the Sunset Crater Volcano National Monument.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
11/16/1990Became Public Law No: 101-612.
11/16/1990Signed by President.
11/09/1990Presented to President.
10/28/1990Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment by Voice Vote.
10/27/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
10/27/1990Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs discharged.
06/14/1990Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
06/07/1990Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston without amendment. With written report No. 101-310.
05/02/1990Introduced in Senate

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber
11/16/1990Became Public Law No: 101-612.
11/16/1990Signed by President.
11/09/1990SenatePresented to President.
11/09/1990SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
11/07/1990SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/28/1990SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment by Voice Vote.
10/27/1990SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
10/27/1990-3:48amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/27/1990-3:47amHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
10/27/1990-3:47amHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
10/27/1990-3:47amHouseH.Amdt.907 On agreeing to the Vento amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
10/27/1990-3:47amHouseH.Amdt.907 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Vento.
10/27/1990-3:47amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent.
10/27/1990-3:45amHouseMr. Vento asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
10/27/1990HouseCommittee on Interior and Insular Affairs discharged.
07/09/1990HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
06/19/1990SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/19/1990HouseReferred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
06/19/1990-12:26pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/14/1990SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
06/07/1990SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 580.
06/07/1990SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston without amendment. With written report No. 101-310.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
05/23/1990SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
05/17/1990SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior, and Office of Management and Budget.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
05/17/1990SenateSubcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests
05/03/1990SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
05/02/1990SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources05/02/1990 Referred to
05/23/1990 Markup by
06/07/1990 Reported by S.Rept 101-310
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests05/03/1990 Referred to
05/17/1990 Hearings by
House Interior and Insular Affairs06/19/1990 Referred to
10/27/1990 Discharged from
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands07/09/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2566.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2566. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/27/1990)

Smith River National Recreation Area Act - Establishes the Smith River National Recreation Area in California.

Amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate certain segments of Smith River as components of the national wild and scenic rivers system.

Establishes streamside protection zones in which timber harvesting is prohibited for each river or segment specified in this Act.

Directs the Secretary of the Interior to assist Del Norte County in the development of a county land information system that will be compatible with Forest Service and National Park Service systems for Federal lands in the County. Authorizes appropriations.

Redesignates the Sunset Crater National Monument, Arizona, as the Sunset Crater Volcano National Monument.