Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 05/16/1990
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 05/16/1990
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 05/16/1990
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 05/16/1990
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/16/1990
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/05/1990
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/10/1990
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/23/1990
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 07/24/1990
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/26/1990
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/26/1990
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/27/1990
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 08/04/1990
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 09/10/1990
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/10/1990
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 09/10/1990
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/12/1990
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 09/14/1990
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/19/1990