Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/22/1990
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 06/22/1990
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 07/17/1990
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 07/17/1990
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 07/17/1990
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/17/1990
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 07/17/1990
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/17/1990
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/17/1990
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 07/17/1990
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 07/17/1990
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/17/1990
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/17/1990
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/17/1990
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/17/1990
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 07/17/1990
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/17/1990
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 07/17/1990
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 07/17/1990
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 07/17/1990
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 07/17/1990
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 07/17/1990
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/17/1990
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 07/17/1990
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/17/1990
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 07/17/1990
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 07/17/1990
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/24/1990
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/24/1990
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 07/24/1990
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/24/1990
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/24/1990
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 07/24/1990
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/24/1990
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/24/1990
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/24/1990
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/26/1990
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 07/26/1990
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/26/1990
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/26/1990
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/26/1990
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/26/1990
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/26/1990
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/27/1990
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 07/27/1990
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 07/27/1990
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/27/1990
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 07/27/1990
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/30/1990
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/30/1990
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/30/1990
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/30/1990
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/30/1990
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 07/30/1990
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/30/1990
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 07/30/1990
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/30/1990
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 07/30/1990
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/30/1990
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 07/30/1990
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 07/30/1990
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 09/24/1990