Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 01/25/1989
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 01/25/1989
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 01/25/1989
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/02/1989
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/23/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 02/23/1989
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/23/1989
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/28/1989
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/28/1989
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 08/04/1989
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 08/04/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 08/04/1989